NE LB303 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-25 - Notice of hearing for February 04, 2021
Pending: Legislature Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide a budget limitation exception as prescribed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide a budget limitation exception as prescribed

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-25LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 04, 2021
2021-01-14LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-01-12LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback