NE LB302 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Enrollment and Review ER13 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to administrative license revocation and reinstatement under the Motor Vehicle Operator's License Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to administrative license revocation and reinstatement under the Motor Vehicle Operator's License Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM49 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER13 filed
2021-02-24LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER13
2021-02-16LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2021-02-16LegislatureTransportation and Telecommunications AM49 adopted
2021-02-02LegislatureTransportation and Telecommunications AM49 filed
2021-02-02LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM49
2021-01-15LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 25, 2021
2021-01-14LegislatureReferred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
2021-01-12LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback