NE LB240 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require use of occupant protection systems for each vehicle occupant
Title
Require use of occupant protection systems for each vehicle occupant
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 26, 2021 |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |