NE LB1277 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1277 amended into LB1024 by AM2687
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1277 amended into LB1024 by AM2687
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Economic Development to provide funds to a county agricultural society with facilities within a city of the primary class
Title
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Economic Development to provide funds to a county agricultural society with facilities within a city of the primary class
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1277 amended into LB1024 by AM2687 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 09, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |