NE LB1264 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to inheritance taxes, sales and use taxes, and income taxes
Title
Change provisions relating to inheritance taxes, sales and use taxes, and income taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-02-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 23, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |