NE LB1238 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Economic Development for the South Omaha Recovery Grant Program
Title
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Economic Development for the South Omaha Recovery Grant Program
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2022 |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |