NE LB1215 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1215 amended into LB450 by AM1943
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1215 amended into LB450 by AM1943
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Small Business Assistance Act and provide for grants
Title
Adopt the Small Business Assistance Act and provide for grants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1215 amended into LB450 by AM1943 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-02-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |