NE LB1155 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Provisions/Portions of LB930 amended into LB1155 by AM2699
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Provisions/Portions of LB930 amended into LB1155 by AM2699
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allow operation of golf car vehicles as prescribed, provide powers for counties, cities, and villages, and change penalties relating to operating a motor vehicle while under orders not to operate a motor vehicle
Title
Allow operation of golf car vehicles as prescribed, provide powers for counties, cities, and villages, and change penalties relating to operating a motor vehicle while under orders not to operate a motor vehicle
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Provisions/Portions of LB930 amended into LB1155 by AM2699 | |
2012-04-18 | Approved by Governor on April 11, 2012 | |
2012-04-05 | Presented to Governor on April 05, 2012 | |
2012-04-05 | President/Speaker signed | |
2012-04-05 | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 | |
2012-04-05 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | |
2012-04-03 | Placed on Final Reading with ST97 | |
2012-04-03 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2012-04-03 | Schumacher FA69 lost | |
2012-04-03 | Schumacher FA69 filed | |
2012-04-03 | Brasch AM2699 adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Placed on Select File | |
2012-03-30 | Brasch AM2699 filed | |
2012-03-29 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2012-02-23 | Placed on General File | |
2012-02-21 | Speaker priority bill | |
2012-01-30 | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2012 | |
2012-01-23 | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee | |
2012-01-19 | Date of introduction |