NE LB1136 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1136 amended into LB909 by AM2284
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1136 amended into LB909 by AM2284
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for custody and disposition of certain vehicles in possession of multistate auction dealers by treating such vehicles as abandoned vehicles
Title
Provide for custody and disposition of certain vehicles in possession of multistate auction dealers by treating such vehicles as abandoned vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1136 amended into LB909 by AM2284 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-02-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2018 |
2018-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2018-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34697 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB1136.pdf |