NE LB1052 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Health and Human Services for the Nebraska Homeless Assistance Program
Title
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Health and Human Services for the Nebraska Homeless Assistance Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 02, 2022 |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |