NE LB1034 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for designation of progress schools and progress plans and state intent to appropriate federal funds
Title
Provide for designation of progress schools and progress plans and state intent to appropriate federal funds
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Pahls [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-02-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 28, 2022 |
2022-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2022-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |