ND SB2377 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 57-39.10-01, 57-39.10-02, 57-39.10-03, and 57-39.10-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to state-tribal agreements for the administration and collection of alcoholic beverages wholesale tax and alcoholic beverages gross receipts tax within the exterior boundaries of a reservation in this state; and to provide for application.
Title
State-tribal agreements for the administration and collection of alcoholic beverages wholesale tax and alcoholic beverages gross receipts tax within the exterior boundaries of a reservation in this state; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/14 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2023-03-09 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2023-03-07 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2023-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-02-17 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation |
2023-02-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation |