ND SB2358 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 32
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 32
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection
Title
A reduction in the rate of state sales, use, and motor vehicle excise taxes; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. George Sinner [D] | Sen. John Grabinger [D] | Sen. Constance Triplett [D] | Sen. John Warner [D] |
Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Lois Delmore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 32 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 2 0 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Amendment failed |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |