ND SB2347 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Drovdal, Weiler A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 57-39.2-04 and a new subsection to section 57-40.2-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to gross receipts from the sale of items delivered electronically; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Drovdal, Weiler A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 57-39.2-04 and a new subsection to section 57-40.2-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to gross receipts from the sale of items delivered electronically; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Dwight Cook [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-19 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-03-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-18 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-10 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-09 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-03-06 | Second reading, passed, yeas 083 nays 003 | |
2009-03-05 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 011 n 000 | |
2009-03-04 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation | |
2009-02-05 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-04 | Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-02-03 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 000 | |
2009-02-02 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-01-20 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2347.html |