ND SB2331 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 68
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 68
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 47-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to move-in and post move-out inspections of leased property.
Title
Move-in and post move-out inspections of leased property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 23 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 68 |
2023-03-24 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 5 1 |
2023-03-22 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2023-02-17 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Industry, Business and Labor |
2023-02-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 39 nays 8 |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:25 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |