ND SB2327 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 16.1-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the reporting of incarcerated felons to the secretary of state.
Title
The reporting of incarcerated felons to the secretary of state.
Sponsors
Sen. Kyle Davison [R] | Sen. Jon Casper [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/16 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-13 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2015-04-08 | House | Conference committee appointed Maragos M. Johnson P. Anderson |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Hogue Luick Nelson |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2015-03-31 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 87 nays 4 |
2015-03-26 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2015-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-05 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |