ND SB2271 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/07
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/07
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 48-05-10, 48-05-11, and 48-05-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to energy conservation measures.
Title
Energy conservation measures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/07 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-29 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 1 |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 0 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Industry, Business and Labor |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |