ND SB2271 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-02 - Signed by Governor 04/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-02 - Signed by Governor 04/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection
Title
The committee on employment of people with disabilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Axness [D] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] | Rep. Gail Mooney [D] |
Rep. Peter Silbernagel [R] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/02 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2013-03-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2013-03-21 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 1 |
2013-03-12 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2013-02-26 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2013-02-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 1 |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 0 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |