ND SB2267 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Signed by Governor 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Signed by Governor 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 26.1-36-41 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the authority of the insurance commissioner to investigate health insurers.
Title
The authority of the insurance commissioner to investigate health insurers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/15 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-10 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 0 |
2017-03-08 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |