ND SB2210 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact two new sections to chapter 54-17, a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 54-60.1-01, a new subsection to section 57-35.3-05, a new section to chapter 57-38, and a new subdivision to subsection 7 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a housing incentive fund and tax credits for contributions to the fund; to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 54-17-07.2 and section 57-35.3-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of multifamily housing facility and payment of the financial institutions tax; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide an effective date; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
The definition of multifamily housing facility and payment of the financial institutions tax; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide an effective date; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Rep. Kathy Hawken [R] | Rep. George Keiser [R] | Sen. Karen Krebsbach [R] | Sen. Stanley Lyson [R] |
Sen. Rich Wardner [R] | Rep. Lonny Winrich [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/26 | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by Governor 04/26 | |
2011-04-22 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-07 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-06 | Concurred | |
2011-03-29 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2011-03-28 | Reconsidered | |
2011-03-25 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 42 nays 46 | |
2011-03-24 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-03-23 | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 4 1 | |
2011-03-15 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-23 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-21 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 | |
2011-01-21 | Committee Hearing 10:15 | |
2011-01-13 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |