ND SB2094 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 65-04-04.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to medical expense assessments; to amend and reenact sections 65-04-22, 65-04-26.1, 65-04-32, and subsections 2, 3, and 4 of section 65-04-33 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to securing premium payments, correct cross references, employer noncompliance, and employer false statements; to repeal section 65-05-07.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to medical expense assessments; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Medical expense assessments; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/29 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 81 nays 11 |
2017-03-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 1 |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2017-01-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |