ND SB2094 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 43-12.1-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to exempting certain employees at the developmental center at westwood park, Grafton, from the requirements of the Nurse Practices Act.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 43-12.1-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to exempting certain employees at the developmental center at westwood park, Grafton, from the requirements of the Nurse Practices Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-19 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-03-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-02 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-02 | Signed by President | |
2009-02-27 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-02-26 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-02-25 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-02-16 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-02-13 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services | |
2009-01-20 | Received from Senate | |
2009-01-19 | Second reading, passed, yeas 042 nays 000 | |
2009-01-15 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-13 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 006 n 000 | |
2009-01-12 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2094.html |