ND SB2087 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 50-09-29 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to requirements for administration of temporary assistance for needy families.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requirements for administration of temporary assistance for needy families.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 14 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-17HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 76
2023-04-17HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 19 0 4
2023-04-13HouseCommittee Hearing 03:30
2023-04-03HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2023-03-30HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2023-03-30HouseReported back, do pass 8 4 2
2023-03-29HouseCommittee Hearing 03:47
2023-03-27HouseCommittee Hearing 11:42
2023-03-14HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2023-02-15HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Human Services
2023-01-20HouseReceived from Senate
2023-01-19SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2023-01-18SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2023-01-10SenateCommittee Hearing 03:00
2023-01-09SenateCommittee Hearing 02:00
2023-01-09SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2023-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred to Human Services

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback