ND SB2076 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-07 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-07 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subdivision vv of subsection 2 of section 12-60-24 and section 23.1-01-11.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to environmental compliance background reviews of applicants for a radioactive materials license or solid waste permit.
Title
Environmental compliance background reviews of applicants for a radioactive materials license or solid waste permit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/05 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/04 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-31 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2023-03-28 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 12 |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2023-03-02 | House | Committee Hearing 01:45 |
2023-02-17 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2023-02-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |