ND SB2076 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section
Title
Judgeships created in 2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2013-04-03 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 1 1 |
2013-03-19 | House | Committee Hearing 09:40 |
2013-02-15 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2013-01-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |