ND SB2076 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 92
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 92
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 39-05-20.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to branding of certificate of title.
Title
Branding of certificate of title.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 92 | |
2011-03-25 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 | |
2011-03-03 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Received from Senate | |
2011-01-31 | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 | |
2011-01-28 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 | |
2011-01-06 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/bill-actions/ba2076.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/documents/11-8047-01000.pdf |