ND SB2076 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 020 nays 070
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 020 nays 070
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 15-10-12.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to authority of the state board of higher education to authorize campus improvements financed by donations, gifts, grants, and bequests.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 15-10-12.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to authority of the state board of higher education to authorize campus improvements financed by donations, gifts, grants, and bequests.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-19 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 020 nays 070 | |
2009-03-17 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 008 n 006 | |
2009-03-02 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-13 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education | |
2009-01-27 | Received from Senate | |
2009-01-26 | Second reading, passed, yeas 045 nays 001 | |
2009-01-23 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-22 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 005 n 000 | |
2009-01-07 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2076.html |