ND SB2057 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 6 of section 38-22-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the delivery of permit hearing notices.
Title
The delivery of permit hearing notices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/14 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2023-03-03 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 0 |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2023-03-02 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-02-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2023-01-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |