ND SB2056 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 52-02.1-01 and sections 52-08-10 and 54-60-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the new jobs training program, workforce training program, and operation intern program; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The new jobs training program, workforce training program, and operation intern program; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/17 | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by Governor 05/17 | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-25 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-22 | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) | |
2011-04-22 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2011-04-21 | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) | |
2011-04-14 | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) | |
2011-04-05 | Conference committee appointed Wall Heilman Mock | |
2011-04-01 | Refused to concur | |
2011-03-31 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2011-03-31 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 64 nays 30 | |
2011-03-30 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-03-29 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 0 0 | |
2011-03-07 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-24 | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 4, Emergency clause carried | |
2011-02-21 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 2 0 | |
2011-01-24 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2011-01-19 | Amendment adopted | |
2011-01-17 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-01-05 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee |