ND HCR3047 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying state and federal veterans' programs, the programs' eligibility requirements, and the efficiency of public or private entities responsible for the administration of state and federal veterans' programs to ensure all current and future North Dakota veterans receive the care, assistance, and benefits to which the veterans are entitled.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying state and federal veterans' programs, the programs' eligibility requirements, and the efficiency of public or private entities responsible for the administration of state and federal veterans' programs to ensure all current and future North Dakota veterans receive the care, assistance, and benefits to which the veterans are entitled.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/05 |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-02 | House | Returned to House |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 2 0 |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-03-04 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 85 nays 3 |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 4 0 |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |