ND HCR3031 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution designating the third week in June as "North Dakota Share the Road Safety Week".
Title
A concurrent resolution designating the third week in June as "North Dakota Share the Road Safety Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Gail Mooney [D] | Rep. William Devlin [R] | Rep. Kathy Hawken [R] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] |
Sen. Dave Oehlke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/31 |
2015-03-31 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-24 | House | Returned to House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-20 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2015-02-16 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 3 3 |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |