ND HCR3019 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 5 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 5 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to amend and reenact sections 1 and 2 of article XV of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to term limits for members of the legislative assembly and statewide elected officers; to repeal section 4 of article XV of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to prohibiting the legislative assembly from proposing certain amendments to article XV of the Constitution of North Dakota; and to provide for application.
Title
Prohibiting the legislative assembly from proposing certain amendments to article XV of the Constitution of North Dakota; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] |
Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Rep. Karen Rohr [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] |
Rep. Steve Vetter [R] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] | Sen. Bob Paulson [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 5 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-14 - House - House Second reading, adopted yeas 63 nays 29 (Y: 63 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Second reading, adopted yeas 63 nays 29 (Y: 63 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | Senate | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 5 nays 41 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Amendment failed |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 2 0 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-03-14 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 63 nays 29 |
2023-03-13 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-10 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2023-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2023-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2023-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Industry, Business and Labor |