ND HCR3009 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution urging Congress to amend the 2014 farm bill to allow counties to use raw yield data from insurance companies to supplement the national agriculture statistics survey to calculate payments under the Agriculture Risk Coverage program when an insufficient number of surveys are returned to accurately calculate payments.
Title
A concurrent resolution urging Congress to amend the 2014 farm bill to allow counties to use raw yield data from insurance companies to supplement the national agriculture statistics survey to calculate payments under the Agriculture Risk Coverage program when an insufficient number of surveys are returned to accurately calculate payments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/22 |
2017-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-14 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2017-01-27 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |