ND HCR3001 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution declaring March 3, 2017, as "National Speech and Debate Education Day".
Title
A concurrent resolution declaring March 3, 2017, as "National Speech and Debate Education Day".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-25 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/13 |
2017-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-09 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-25 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 87 nays 6 |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |