ND HB1486 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 5 of section 51-34-01 and sections 51-34-02, 51-34-04, and 51-34-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to limitations on the authorized access to telephone records and the sale or procurement of telephone records; to provide a penalty; and to provide for application.
Title
Limitations on the authorized access to telephone records and the sale or procurement of telephone records; to provide a penalty; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Rep. Cole Christensen [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Sebastian Ertelt [R] | Rep. Terry Jones [R] |
Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] | Rep. Matthew Ruby [R] | Rep. Steve Vetter [R] | Sen. Doug Larsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 4 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 77 nays 15 |
2021-02-12 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 5 0 |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |