ND HB1486 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 1-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to designating central standard time as the official standard time for North Dakota.
Title
Designating central standard time as the official standard time for North Dakota.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 11 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on table |
2019-02-20 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 11 nays 81 |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 8 6 0 |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |