ND HB1406 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 7 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an income tax credit for the employment of individuals with developmental disability or severe mental illness; to amend and reenact section 57-38-01.16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an income tax credit for the employment of individuals with developmental disabilities or severe mental illness; and to provide an effective date.
Title
An income tax credit for the employment of individuals with developmental disabilities or severe mental illness; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Lauriebeth Hager [D] | Rep. Mark Sanford [R] | Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] |
Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2019-04-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-02 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 2 |
2019-04-02 | House | Concurred |
2019-03-25 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-08 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 3 |
2019-02-05 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-04 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |