ND HB1405 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 39-10 and a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 39-06.1-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibiting blocking parking spaces for electric vehicles; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Prohibiting blocking parking spaces for electric vehicles; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 24 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Signed by Governor 03/28 |
2019-03-28 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 24 nays 21 |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 1 1 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 63 nays 27 |
2019-02-11 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 5 1 |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |