ND HB1397 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the introduction of bills by executive branch agencies and the judicial branch.
Title
The introduction of bills by executive branch agencies and the judicial branch.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 4 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 48 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 48 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-21 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 48 nays 44 |
2017-02-16 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 6 0 |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |