ND HB1381 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 11 nays 83
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 11 nays 83
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-38 and a new subdivision to subsection? 7 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an income tax credit equal to a portion of a taxpayer's federal earned income credit; and to provide an effective date.
Title
An income tax credit equal to a portion of a taxpayer's federal earned income credit; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Guggisberg [D] | Rep. Pamela Anderson [D] | Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] | Rep. Mary Schneider [D] |
Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 11 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 11 nays 83 |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 2 1 |
2017-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |