ND HB1339 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 62.1-02-10, 62.1-03-01, 62.1-04-02, 62.1-04-03, and 62.1-04-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to carrying a loaded firearm in a vehicle, carrying a handgun, carrying a concealed firearm, a license to carry a concealed firearm, and producing a license upon request; to repeal section 2 of chapter 499 of the 2021 Session Laws, relating to a contingent expiration date for concealed weapon provisions; and to provide a penalty.
Title
A contingent expiration date for concealed weapon provisions; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-14 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12 |
2023-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2023-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned to House |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 3 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2023-02-20 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee Hearing 09:40 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee Hearing 08:05 |
2023-02-10 | House | Committee Hearing 08:25 |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2023-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2023-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |