ND HB1307 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 64
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 64
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 15.1-21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to descriptions of elementary and high school content.
Title
Descriptions of elementary and high school content.
Sponsors
Rep. Bette Grande [R] | Rep. Michael Brandenburg [R] | Rep. Brenda Heller [R] | Rep. Lisa Meier [R] |
Rep. Karen Rohr [R] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Gary Lee [R] | Sen. Margaret Sitte [R] |
Sen. Ronald Sorvaag [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-07 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 64 |
2013-02-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 4 0 |
2013-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |