ND HB1305 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 2-06-01, 2-06-01.1, 2-06-01.2, 2-06-02, 2-06-03, 2-06-04, 2-06-06, 2-06-07, 2-06-08, 2-06-09, 2-06-10, 2-06-11, 2-06-12, 2-06-13, 2-06-14, 2-06-15, 2-06-16, 2-06-17, 2-06-18, 2-06-19, 2-06-20, 2-06-21, and 2-06-22 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the form and style of statutes governing airport authorities; and to repeal sections 2-06-05 and 2-06-23 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to airport authorities.
Title
Airport authorities.
Sponsors
Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] | Rep. Tom Kading [R] | Rep. Christopher Olson [R] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] |
Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Dwight Cook [R] | Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Signed by Governor 03/24 |
2017-03-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-20 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-31 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |