ND HB1257 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subdivision a of subsection 2 of section 23-15-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to fireworks permitted to be sold.
Title
Fireworks permitted to be sold.
Sponsors
Rep. Blair Thoreson [R] | Rep. Joe Heilman [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] |
Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Sen. Ronald Sorvaag [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 29 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 2 0 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 53 nays 37 |
2013-02-08 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 5 0 |
2013-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2013-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba1257.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-0602-01000.pdf |