ND HB1249 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Signed by Governor 04/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Signed by Governor 04/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 39-34-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to regulation of transportation network companies.
Title
Regulation of transportation network companies.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Michael Howe [R] | Rep. Mike Nathe [R] | Rep. Emily O'Brien [R] |
Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] | Sen. Jon Casper [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Signed by Governor 04/03 |
2017-03-31 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-31 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-02 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2017-01-31 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-30 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2017-01-19 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |