ND HB1244 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 42
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 42
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 11-11-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the authority of boards of county commissioners to approve the exercise of the power of quick take eminent domain by water resource boards; and to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 61-16.1-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the authority of water resource boards to exercise the power of quick take eminent domain.
Title
The authority of water resource boards to exercise the power of quick take eminent domain.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 2 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 42 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 1 0 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 2 |
2017-02-21 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2017-01-20 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |