ND HB1230 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 52-06-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to unemployment insurance maximum potential benefits; and to provide for application.
Title
Unemployment insurance maximum potential benefits; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Roger Brabandt [R] | Rep. Tom Kading [R] |
Rep. Christopher Olson [R] | Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 15 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-19 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 75 |
2017-01-18 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 3 1 |
2017-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |