ND HB1170 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a property tax exemption for certain natural gas pipeline property; and to provide an effective date.
Title
A property tax exemption for certain natural gas pipeline property; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/21 |
2023-04-24 | House | Signed by Governor 04/20 |
2023-04-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-12 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 1 |
2023-04-12 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-10 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Weber Magrum Piepkorn |
2023-04-03 | House | Conference committee appointed Hagert Motschenbacher Finley-DeVille |
2023-04-03 | House | Refused to concur |
2023-03-17 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 0 2 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:20 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-01-11 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 2 |
2023-01-10 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2023-01-10 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation |