ND HB1145 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 60
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 60
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 5-01-11 and subsection 6 of section 5-01-21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a financial interest between alcohol retailers and manufacturers.
Title
A financial interest between alcohol retailers and manufacturers.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Becker [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 33 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-26 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 60 |
2017-01-23 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 6 0 |
2017-01-10 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |