ND HB1132 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact sections 26.1-10-06.1, 26.1-10-06.2, and 26.1-10-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to insurance holding company systems; to amend and reenact sections 26.1-10-01, 26.1-10-02, 26.1-10-03, 26.1-10-03.1, 26.1-10-04, 26.1-10-05, 26.1-10-05.1, 26.1-10-06, 26.1-10-07, 26.1-10-08, 26.1-10-09, 26.1-10-10, 26.1-10-10.1, and 26.1-10-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to insurance holding company systems; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Insurance holding company systems; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | Signed by Governor 03/20 |
2015-03-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-16 | House | Returned to House |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-01-21 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2015-01-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-01-16 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 2 |
2015-01-12 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |